+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0710)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 710 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1610ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100296D
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor