+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (HB1878-Cosgrove) by voice vote
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends incorporating into HB1878 by voice vote
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance
On November 12, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 092208732
+ − Vote
January 21, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor