+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 414 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1610ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (92-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (92-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 17101921D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1610E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101921D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 2017: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2017: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2017: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (92-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor