+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N)
- Read third time and passed House (82-Y 17-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 080534404-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB161H1
On February 9, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 080534404-H1
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
On December 21, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080317404