+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 811 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1609ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Committee amendment rejected
- Pending question ordered (23-Y 17-N)
- Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 4-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (79-Y 21-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 21-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106560D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1609H1
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106560D-H1
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Unanimous consent to introduce
- Presented and ordered printed 18106257D
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Votes (8)
February 28, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N)
February 28, 2018: Pending question ordered (23-Y 17-N)
February 27, 2018: Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 4-N)
February 19, 2018: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 21-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
February 7, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor