+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 4 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1608ER)
- Enrolled
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101542D
+ − Votes (5)
February 8, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2011: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor