+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 53 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1607ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101413D
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2015: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2015: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor