+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 608 (effective - see bill)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1605ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Emergency clause deleted
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1605H1
- Emergency clause added
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106888D-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18106888D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 18105635D
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Votes (7)
March 5, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2018: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2018: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor