+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 10, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1119)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1119 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1602ER)
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (88-Y 10-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (88-Y 10-N)
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 20109754D-H2
- Amended by conference committee
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators: Edwards, Newman, Ebbin
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Delegates: Austin, Bulova, Plum
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute rejected by House 20108381D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1602S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108381D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20108381D-S1
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 8-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1602H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107730D-H1
- Read second time
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20107730D-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed 20104632D
+ − Impact Statements (5)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
March 7, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (88-Y 10-N)
February 27, 2020: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
February 21, 2020: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2020: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Terry L. Austin
Type:
Primary Sponsor