+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 491 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1600ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 13-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107271D-S1 (85-Y 13-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 6-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1600S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107271D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107271D-S1
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (84-Y 15-N)
- Passed House (84-Y 15-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N)
- Read third time and passed House (83-Y 15-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1600H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106154D-H1
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18106154D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed 18105597D
+ − Votes (8)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 13-N)
February 26, 2018: Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 6-N)
February 23, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2018: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
February 6, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N)
February 6, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (84-Y 15-N)
January 31, 2018: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
January 29, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor