+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0970)
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov's rec. BLOCK VOICE VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1600ER2)
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 970 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1600ER)
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 032040916-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 032040916-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 032040916-H1
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub (25-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/23/02 031971825
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 2, 2003: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2003: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2003: Reported from Appropriations with sub (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor