+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 11, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397)
On April 4, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 397 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB160ER)
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 008467408-S1
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 008467408-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 008467408-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 002801904-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Del. Reid agreed to
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd (23-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 12, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 002801904
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2000: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: Reported from Finance with amd (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor