+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 556 (effective 1/1/17)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB16ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 16100494D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB16E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On November 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100494D