+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0076)
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0076)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 76 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB16ER)
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (25-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: 10
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 11/17/03 044829760