+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0430)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 430 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1599ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 1-N)
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1599H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 093408528-H1
- Read second time
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 093408528-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education and Arts
On October 22, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 096152528