+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- House sustained Governor's veto
- Placed on Calendar
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1596ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N)
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 31-N)
- Read third time and passed House (67-Y 31-N)
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 7-N)
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100238D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2017: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
February 15, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2017: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N)
January 23, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 31-N)
January 17, 2017: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 7-N)
January 12, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor