+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Left in Transportation
On January 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 978173100-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 3
On January 8, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/02/96 978173100
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 24, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 21, 1997: Reported from Tra. w/amds. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor