+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 17, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0796)
On April 6, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 796 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1589ER)
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed 069850306
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2006: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2006: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor