+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 22, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0440)
On March 20, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 440 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1587ER)
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 017025760-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 25, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 11/06/00 017025760
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2001: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2001: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor