+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 24, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0137)
On March 20, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 137 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1587ER)
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 058903484-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1587E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amd (20-Y 0-N)
On December 10, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 058903484
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2005: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2005: Reported from Tra. w/amd (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor