+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 149 (effective 7/1/20)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 4, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2020
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1585ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Charters
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 20104918D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (8)
February 19, 2020: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2020: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2020: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2020: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2020: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N)
January 31, 2020: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N)
January 23, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
C. Matthew Fariss
Type:
Primary Sponsor