+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Stricken at the request of Patron in Courts of Justice by voice vote
On January 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed House (88-Y 5-N)
On January 19, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 18, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 17, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 14, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 3-N)
On December 10, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 051185484
+ − Votes (2)
January 20, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 5-N)
January 12, 2005: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor