+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 16, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 416 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1582ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 18-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (81-Y 18-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 6-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 25-N)
- Read third time and passed House (73-Y 25-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1582H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104252D-H1
- Read second time
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104252D-H1
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #1
On January 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103101D