+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- No further action taken
- Failed to pass
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Obenshain, McDougle, Edwards
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Cline, Bell, Robert B., Bourne
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute rejected by House 18107906D-S2 (0-Y 96-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute rejected 18107678D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107906D-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1580S2
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107906D-S2
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107678D-S1
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 10-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 1-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed 18105108D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice