+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0261)
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 261 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1576ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 086004652
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2008: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor