+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104102D
- Referred to Committee on Finance