+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 4-N 1-A)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 23-N)
- Read third time and passed House (75-Y 23-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11101224D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1573E
- Amendment by Delegate Morrissey rejected
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (16-Y 5-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N)
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101224D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 14, 2011: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 4-N 1-A)
February 8, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 23-N)
January 31, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (16-Y 5-N)
January 17, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor