+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691)
On March 21, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 691 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 6, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB157ER)
On February 21, 1997 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Senate amendment #3 rejected by conf. comm.
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 4-N)
On February 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONFERENCE COMMITTEE RPT (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 4-N)
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senators: Marsh, Edwards, Reynolds
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Delegates: Griffith, Jones, J.C., Deeds
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amds. #1,2,4 & 5 agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Title replaced
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- Senate amendment #3 rejected by House (3-Y 95-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (3-Y 95-N)
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (95-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 1997 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 971528254-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 971528254-H1
- Read second time
On January 9, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On December 26, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 971528254-H1
On December 23, 1996 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 962040254
On December 20, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1996 in the House:
- Continued to 1997 in Courts of Justice (20-Y 2-N)
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 10, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 962040254