+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0050)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 50 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1567ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101967D
+ − Votes (7)
February 13, 2015: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2015: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2015: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor