+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0108)
On March 16, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 108 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1567ER)
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Civil Law
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote)(100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 994571308-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/12/99 994571308