+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 6, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0652)
On March 28, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 652 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1565ER)
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N)
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Civil Law
On January 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 27, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 5-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 999468308-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Mr. Woodrum agreed to
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/12/99 999468308
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 1-N)
February 18, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N)
January 27, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N)
January 22, 1999: Reported from C. J. with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor