+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0555)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 555 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB156ER)
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 2-N)
- Conference substitute printed 14105574D-H2
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 2-N)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Delegates: Minchew, Anderson, Carr
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senators: Black, Puckett, Vogel
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House 14105057D-S1 (1-Y 97-N 1-A)
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N 1-A)
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB156S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105057D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14105057D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB156H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104707D-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104707D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On December 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102059D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
March 7, 2014: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2014: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 2-N)
February 26, 2014: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2014: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N 1-A)
February 20, 2014: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2014: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2014: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor