+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N)
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
On December 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101970D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
January 29, 2020: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2020: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N)
January 20, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Mark D. Sickles
Type:
Primary Sponsor