+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 587 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1559ER)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 030832876-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 030832876-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 030832876-S1
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 030493876-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 030493876-H1
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 030493876-H1
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/20/02 030748876
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
January 31, 2003: Reported from C. J. with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor