+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 8, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0826)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 826 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1559ER)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (24-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/12/99 993308843
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1999: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 19, 1999: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor