+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0179)
On March 16, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 179 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1558ER)
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 035413408-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 035413408-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 035413408-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 5-N)
On January 22, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/20/02 034073650
+ − Votes (6)
February 10, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N)
January 20, 2003: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor