+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 556 (effective 7/1/13)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1558ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Black, Favola, Smith
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Minchew, LeMunyon, McQuinn
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 94-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 13105192D-S1 (2-Y 94-N)
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1558S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13105192D-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13105192D-S1
- Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1558H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104342D-H1
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104342D-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On January 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100438D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
February 23, 2013: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2013: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2013: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 94-N)
February 15, 2013: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2013: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor