+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Norment, Wagner, Saslaw
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Kilgore, Habeeb, Bagby
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (30-Y 8-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House 18107332D-S1 (0-Y 95-N 2-A)
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N 2-A)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Amendment by Senator Wagner withdrawn
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107332D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1558S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 13-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 3-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107332D-S1
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (63-Y 35-N 2-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 35-N 2-A)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106949D-H1
- Amendment by Delegate Toscano agreed to (55-Y 41-N 2-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (55-Y 41-N 2-A)
- Motion to pass by the amendment by Delegate Rasoul agreed to (49-Y 46-N)
- VOTE: Pass By (49-Y 46-N)
- Amendment by Delegate Toscano reconsidered
- Amendment by Delegate Toscano agreed to (96-Y 1-N 2-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (96-Y 1-N 2-A)
- Amendments by Delegate Toscano withdrawn
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1558EH1
- Printed as engrossed 18106949D-EH1
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 4-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106949D-H1
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed 18105524D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor