+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Letter sent to Crime Commission
- Continued to 2007 in Courts of Justice with letter (13-Y 2-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1557H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 060034232-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety (Sherwood)
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 060034232-H1
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 061354232
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 061354232
- Unanimous consent to introduce