+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/amendments (11-Y 9-N)
On January 5, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 051258472
On December 2, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 051258472
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
January 21, 2005: Reported from P. & E. w/amendments (11-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor