+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0391)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 391 (effective 7/1/11 - see bill)
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1554ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1554H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104950D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Incorporates HB2378
- Committee substitute printed 11104950D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N)
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: #1 Standards of Quality
On January 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102465D
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor