+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (58)
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0954)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 954 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1552ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 42-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (53-Y 42-N)
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference report rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
- Senate requested second conference committee (28-Y 12-N)
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Motion for second committee of conference agreed to
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request for second conference committee (28-Y 10-N)
- Senators: Marsden, Favola, Pillion
- Second conferees appointed by Senate
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (28-Y 11-N)
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Second conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Levine, Gooditis, Fariss
- Second Conference substitute printed 20109930D-H3
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (49-Y 47-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (49-Y 47-N)
- First Conference substitute printed 20109714D-H2
- Amended by conference committee
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators: Marsden, Favola, Pillion
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Delegates: Levine, Gooditis, Fariss
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 20109122D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (19-Y 17-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1552S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20109122D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20109122D-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 5-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (64-Y 33-N)
- Read third time and passed House (64-Y 33-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1552H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107749D-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20107749D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
On January 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 20105457D
+ − Impact Statements (5)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (14)
March 8, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 42-N)
March 7, 2020: Senate requested second conference committee (28-Y 12-N)
March 7, 2020: Conference report agreed to by Senate (28-Y 11-N)
March 7, 2020: Conference report rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
March 5, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (49-Y 47-N)
March 3, 2020: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2020: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
February 28, 2020: Passed Senate with substitute (19-Y 17-N)
February 27, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 5-N)
February 11, 2020: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 33-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
January 29, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Mark H. Levine
Type:
Primary Sponsor