+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Education and Health (5-Y 9-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 29-N)
- Read third time and passed House (71-Y 29-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Education (9-Y 5-N)
- Reconsidered by Education
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Education (11-Y 11-N)
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Education Reform
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102565D