+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Finance by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989699492-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989699492-H1
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 989699492-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (27-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 987342492
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (27-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor