+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 7, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0817)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 817 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1548ER)
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (76-Y 21-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 20109106D-S1 (76-Y 21-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 2-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1548S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20109106D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (11-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Committee substitute printed 20109106D-S1
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N)
- Read third time and passed House (81-Y 18-N)
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1548H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107125D-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20107125D-H1
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
On January 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 20104355D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 4, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (76-Y 21-N)
March 3, 2020: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 2-N)
March 2, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2020: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (11-Y 0-N 2-A)
February 7, 2020: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N)
February 4, 2020: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N)
January 30, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
January 30, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Marcus B. Simon
Type:
Primary Sponsor