+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 5, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0591)
On March 27, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 591 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1542ER)
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 999616450-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 999616450-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 999616450-S1
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 992693450-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 992693450-H1
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 992693450-H1
On February 2, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: Compensation/Retirement
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/99 992629450
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1999: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor