+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1235)
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 16-N)
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 1235 (effective - see bill)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (62-Y 31-N)
- VOTE: (62-Y 31-N)
- Placed on Calendar
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1541ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 11, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1541ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 28-N)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108772D-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 14-N)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108772D-S1 (65-Y 28-N)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1541S1
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20108772D-S1
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (66-Y 32-N)
- Read third time and passed House (66-Y 32-N)
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Committee on Finance substitute rejected 20107025D-H1
- Read second time
- Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 20107480D-H2
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1541H2
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20107480D-H2
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 2-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 20107025D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 4-N)
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 20104391D
+ − Impact Statements (8)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
April 22, 2020: VOTE: (62-Y 31-N)
April 22, 2020: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 16-N)
February 26, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 28-N)
February 26, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2020: Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 14-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 7, 2020: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 32-N)
February 3, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2020: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 2-N)
January 29, 2020: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 4-N)
January 24, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Delores L. McQuinn
Type:
Primary Sponsor