+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 247 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1539ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1539H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104113D-H1
- Read second time
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104113D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #4
On January 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103094D
+ − Votes (6)
February 11, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2013: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2013: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor