+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 329 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1538ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1538H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104237D-H1
- Read second time
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Substitute bill reprinted 11104237D-H1
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11104237D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On December 28, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100900D
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor