+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0293)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 293 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1537ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1537H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104480D-H1
- Read second time
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17104480D-H1
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #2
On December 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102849D